on June 12, 2021.
and her husband, Adam, welcomed a daughter, Sloane Penelope Galvan, on Jan. 8, 2022.
started as a subcontract administrator in the aerospace and defense industry with United Launch Alliance.
James Lentz ’50,
July 26, 2021 (Gamma Nu).
Helen Lewis Archer ’50,
June 10, 2021 (Gamma Delta).
Alessandra McNamara ’15
started a new position as outpatient nursing supervisor at Amita Health Alexian Brothers Behavioral Health Hospital.
Joe Rheinecker ’07
was appointed chief financial officer of Great Rivers Bank.
Brant Bess ’18
graduated and received his doctorate in May 2021. Brant got married to Miranda on July 2, 2021. He also started working at Citizens Memorial Hospital in August.
Martha Bryan Schmitt ’73
retired in May 2021 from her position as academic coordinator for the Slane College of Communication and Fine Arts at Bradley University in Peoria, Illinois. Martha was subsequently granted emerita status by Bradley University for her distinguished years of service. Martha was also the recipient of Bradley University's 2020-2021 Staff Excellence Award for her "significant contributions to the Bradley University community."
Greg and Nona Bickel Neff ’71
celebrated their 50th anniversary on Aug. 1, 2021.
Wendy Good Henry ’83
was named the 2020 PRIDE Award recipient during BKD CPAs & Advisors annual leadership conference. The PRIDE Award recognizes individuals who emulate the BKD PRIDE values of passion, respect, integrity, discipline and excellence. Wendy was St. Louis managing partner and retired June 2021.
John Kirkham ’13
became a licensed customs broker in January of 2021. He is an import broker with STIHL USA in Virginia Beach, Virginia.
Dave Jacobs ’87
received the Illinois High School Football Coaches Association Hall of Fame distinguished Ray Eliot Award for his service to high school football in the state on June 19, 2021.
Dale Bellovich ’62
and his wife, Lisa-Marie, moved from San Diego, California, to the Charleston, South Carolina, area in May of 2021. They are living on Johns Island, South Carolina.
Abby Isham ’21
was recognized by the Springfield Fire Department for helping to save a man’s life at Colony West Swim Club Pool, where she was a lifeguard. Abby and two others received the department’s Protecting Our Neighbors awards for their efforts after a man went into full cardiac arrest at the pool.
Lauryn Thornton ’21
started a new position as the new membership manager at the Illinois Chamber of Commerce.
Lisa Fay Seaway ’99
and Daniel Seaway on June 10, 2021.
Mouna Soumahoro ’12
welcomed a son, Liam, in June 2021.
Christian Flores ’18
is studying at the LBJ School of Public Affairs at the University of Texas at Austin. He will be earning a master of global policy studies, with a specialization in Latin American regional politics as part of the D.C. concentration. He will be taking classes in Austin and then working on a policy apprenticeship with a non-profit or government organization in Washington D.C.
Jovanny Nava ’16
accepted a position with Polsinelli as a 2022 Summer Associate.
Morgan Zytseva ’15
is now staff auditor at Harrington Group CPAs and is a licensed CPA in Michigan.
Robert Brown ’14
started a new position as director of corporate ticket sales at Pacers Sports & Entertainment.
Dr. Clare Zimmerman ’11
graduated from pediatric hematology and oncology fellowship from Washington University School of Medicine St. Louis Children’s Hospital with a master’s degree in clinical investigation in June 2021. She started as a pediatric hematologist and oncologist at Southern Illinois University School of Medicine in August 2021.