on June 12, 2021.
and her husband, Adam, welcomed a daughter, Sloane Penelope Galvan, on Jan. 8, 2022.
started as a subcontract administrator in the aerospace and defense industry with United Launch Alliance.
Erika Rasch Hunt ’96
started a new position as project director at Regional Office of Education 17.
Dianne Pruitt Potter ’77
retired after 36 years as human resources manager for Parkview Health in Fort Wayne, Indiana.
Rick Vuylsteke ’66
joined the faculty at the Daniel K. Inouye Asia Pacific Center for Security Studies as a professor Jan. 3 after serving as president of the East-West Center in Honolulu for five years.
Monica Pappas ’20
started as a subcontract administrator in the aerospace and defense industry with United Launch Alliance.
Amber Kleckler ’11
and her husband, David, welcomed a daughter, Sawyer Faye, on January 4, 2022.
Dominic Caldieraro ’20
and Kayle Crawford Nov. 20, 2021.
Rebecca Gerecke ’10
and Alan Grant Wilson, Jr., Nov. 13, 2021.
Chris Moore ’19 and Markie Mulchay ’20,
July 2021.
Skylar Dees ’22
was promoted to ÌìÃÀ´«Ã½Store manager at ÌìÃÀ´«Ã½.
Seth Vaughn ’21
started a new position as operations coordinator at Stifel Financial Corp.
Ryan Kaufmann ’21
started a new position as third golf assistant at Illini Country Club.
Brett Bettis ’21
is the owner of Bolt’s Candy, Cones and Corn, a sweet-tooth-indulgent store in Jacksonville. He opened the store in August.
Grant Flynn ’21
started a new position as loan officer at Pilot Grove Savings Bank.
Nick Rentschler ’20
was promoted to Software Engineer II at Mastercard.
Anthony Flores ’20
started a new position as TRIO academic coach and student engagement coordinator at ÌìÃÀ´«Ã½.
Madelyn Budd ’20
started working at BKD.
Ka-La Harris ’19
started a new position at University of Health Sciences & Pharmacy in St. Louis.
Chauntel Vance ’19
started a new position as high school counselor at Taylorville High School.
Allison Hewitt Pilarte ’19
started a new position as revenue tax specialist trainee at Illinois Department of Revenue.
Megan Zirkelbach ’17
was promoted to procurement agent II at Boeing.